Global patent index - EP 0997648 A1

EP 0997648 A1 2000-05-03 - Pneumatic cylinder with simplified damping

Title (en)

Pneumatic cylinder with simplified damping

Title (de)

Pneumatikzylinder mit vereinfachter Dämpfung

Title (fr)

Vérin pneumatique à amortissement simplifié

Publication

EP 0997648 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116341 A

Priority

FR 9813409 A

Abstract (en)

The pneumatic cylinder has a damping ring(5) encompassing the pin(3) formed with the piston, whereby the pin selectively penetrates into the bore, and a circumferential groove(50) in which fits an annular seal(6). The annular seal is separated from the piston(2) by a distance(D) lying over the axial length(L) of the bore(13) and is dimensioned for selective sealing of the bore. A clearance(J) is provided between the pin and ring to enable a discharge of pneumatic fluids between the working chamber(10) and distribution chamber(4) while the annular seal closes off the bore.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Pneumatikzylinder, welcher aus einem Körper (1), der eine, durch einen Boden (11) verschlossene Arbeitskammer (10) definiert, einem in der Arbeitskammer (10) gleitenden Kolben (2), einem mit dem Kolben (2) einstückigen und den Boden (11) durchstoßenden Stift (3) und einer in den Boden eingelassenen, mit der Arbeitskammer (10) über eine zylindrische Bohrung (13) in Verbindung stehenden Verteilerkammer (4) besteht. Der Pneumatikzylinder besteht aus einem den Stift (13) umgebenden und eine eigene zurwahlweisen Abdichtung der Bohrung (13) bestimmte Ringdichtung (6) tragenden Dämpfungsring (5) , wobei ein Spielraum (J) zwischen dem Stift (3) und dem Ring (5) vorgesehen ist, um ein Abfließen des pneumatischen Fluids zwischen der Arbeitskammer (10) und der Verteilerkammer (4) während die Ringdichtung (6) die Bohrung (13) verschließt, zu ermöglichen, wobei diese keine Einstellung erfordernde Anordnung eine Bewegungsdämfung des Kolbens in Endstellung ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/222 (2013.01); F15B 15/223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997648 A1 20000503; EP 0997648 B1 20031119; DE 59907792 D1 20031224; FR 2785023 A1 20000428; FR 2785023 B1 20010803

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59907792

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050819

2005-08-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050819

2005-08-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050819

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907792

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021015

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI