Global Patent Index - EP 0997684 A2

EP 0997684 A2 2000-05-03 - Headlamp

Title (en)

Headlamp

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Projecteur

Publication

EP 0997684 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250364 A

Priority

DE 29819688 U

Abstract (en)

The spotlight has a casing in which a lamp is provided and at least one cover element (2) closing the casing at the front in the light beam direction. The cover element is pivoted to the casing on a turning axis (8) which runs along straight lines (secants) intersecting at two points which have a distance from each other. The turning axis runs close to or through the bisector of the cover element. At least one stop may be provided to limit the opening angle of the cover element, which may consist of a lens, possibly a Fresnel lens.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Scheinwerfer, insbesondere Bühnen-, Studio-, Film- und/oder Fernsehscheinwerfer, mit einem Gehäuse, einer in dem Gehäuse angeordneten Lampe und mindestens einem Abdeckelement, das das Gehäuse frontseitig, in Abstrahlrichtung der Lampe verschließt und zum Öffnen des Gehäuses schwenkbar am Gehäuse angebracht ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß die Schwenkachse (8) des Abdeckelements (2) entlang einer das Abdeckelement (2) in zwei voneinander beabstandeten Punkten schneidenden Gerade (Sekante) verläuft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/10 (2006.01); F21V 19/04 (2006.01); F21V 21/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/107 (2013.01); F21V 19/04 (2013.01); F21V 21/30 (2013.01); F21W 2131/406 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6386738 B1 20020514; EP 0997684 A2 20000503; EP 0997684 A3 20011024; EP 0997684 B1 20050330

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060102

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050517

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911836

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031113

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020221

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21V 17/02 A

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI