Global Patent Index - EP 0997697 A2

EP 0997697 A2 2000-05-03 - Apparatus for drying and cooling freshly printed paper webs

Title (en)

Apparatus for drying and cooling freshly printed paper webs

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trocknen und Kühlen frisch bedruckter Papierbahnen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour sécher et refroidir des bandes de papier fraîchement imprimées

Publication

EP 0997697 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120179 A

Priority

DE 29819202 U

Abstract (en)

Nozzles are arranged along the path followed by the strip through the drier and cooler. They discharge hot drying gas or cold air onto the strip. The after-burner chamber is connected to a suction pipe extracting the drying gas enriched by volatile oil or resin, also to feed pipes for clean gas to the nozzles and to an exhaust pipe for surplus clean gas. An absorption-type refrigerator (4) contains a boiler (14) for the concentrated refrigerating solution and an evaporator (21) for liquid refrigerating medium, being thermally connected to the drier (1) and cooler (3). Heat extracted from the clean gas flowing through the exhaust pipe (16) is fed to the boiler and that from the cold air inside the cooler or the fresh air flowing into the cooler is fed to the evaporator.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Offset-Trocknung wird die frisch bedruckte Papierbahn auf etwa 130 °C erhitzt. Hinter dem Trockner wird die Bahn durch Kontakt mit Kühlwalzen auf 20 bis 30 °C gekühlt, bevor sie einem nachgeschaltetem Falzwerk zugeführt wird. Es ist auch bekannt, die Bahn hinter dem Trockner zunächst durch Anblasen mit Umgebungsluft auf etwa 90 Grad vorzukühlen, bevor sie zu den Kühlwalzen gelangt. Gemäß der Erfindung wird die Bahn mit Luft auf eine wesentlich unter 90 Grad liegende Temperatur gekühlt. Auf diese Weise wird es möglich, die Anzahl der Kühlwalzen zu verringern, vorzugsweise sogar die Kühlwalzen entbehrlich zu machen. Bei der neuen Vorrichtung wird die Kühlluft durch eine Absorptionskälteanlage (4) gekühlt. Die erforderliche Wärme wird der Absorptionskälteanlage (4) durch das heiße Abgas einer Nachbrennkammer (2) zugeführt, die bei modernen Offset-Trocknern üblicher Weise zur Verbrennung der im Trockner flüchtig gewordenen Lösemittel dient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/20; F26B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/04 (2006.01); F26B 13/20 (2006.01); F26B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/104 (2013.01); B41F 23/0476 (2013.01); F26B 23/022 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819202 U1 19990211; EP 0997697 A2 20000503; EP 0997697 A3 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI