Global Patent Index - EP 0997697 A3

EP 0997697 A3 2001-03-14 - Apparatus for drying and cooling freshly printed paper webs

Title (en)

Apparatus for drying and cooling freshly printed paper webs

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trocknen und Kühlen frisch bedruckter Papierbahnen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour sécher et refroidir des bandes de papier fraîchement imprimées

Publication

EP 0997697 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99120179 A

Priority

DE 29819202 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0997697A2] Nozzles are arranged along the path followed by the strip through the drier and cooler. They discharge hot drying gas or cold air onto the strip. The after-burner chamber is connected to a suction pipe extracting the drying gas enriched by volatile oil or resin, also to feed pipes for clean gas to the nozzles and to an exhaust pipe for surplus clean gas. An absorption-type refrigerator (4) contains a boiler (14) for the concentrated refrigerating solution and an evaporator (21) for liquid refrigerating medium, being thermally connected to the drier (1) and cooler (3). Heat extracted from the clean gas flowing through the exhaust pipe (16) is fed to the boiler and that from the cold air inside the cooler or the fresh air flowing into the cooler is fed to the evaporator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/20; F26B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/04 (2006.01); F26B 13/20 (2006.01); F26B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/104 (2013.01); B41F 23/0476 (2013.01); F26B 23/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819202 U1 19990211; EP 0997697 A2 20000503; EP 0997697 A3 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI