Global Patent Index - EP 0997698 A1

EP 0997698 A1 2000-05-03 - Material check-valve for a feeding hopper

Title (en)

Material check-valve for a feeding hopper

Title (de)

Gutabsperrklappe für einen Fülltrichter

Title (fr)

Clapet de retenue de matiere pour une tremie d'alimentation

Publication

EP 0997698 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99119665 A

Priority

LU 90308 A

Abstract (en)

A ring (28) restricts the diameter of the passage formed by the main valve seat (16). An actuator mechanism moves the ring between a position of restriction and one completely clearing the main valve seat. Preferred Features: The ring includes a circular passage opening (34) for material flow. The ring fits against the main seat and provides a secondary seat (40) for the closed valve flap (46). The central insert (32) with reduced opening is interchangeable within the circular frame (30) of the ring. A spherical sealing surface on the ring closes against a conical sealing surface on the main seat. The flap has a spherical seat against a conical seat of the secondary seal. The seating surfaces are flexible. An edge of the flap surrounding its central recess, exceeds in height, the diameter of the largest particle handled. The flap is held in a system of arms on staggered axes, with bolts and locknuts for adjustment. The main pivot is on a horizontal axis. A Cardan joint is included.

Abstract (fr)

Un clapet de retenue de matière pour équiper une ouverture de décharge (12) d'une trémie (14) comprend un siège principal (16), qui est muni d'une ouverture de passage pour la décharge du contenu de la trémie, un organe d'obturation (46) mobile et un mécanisme d'entraînement apte à entraîner l'organe d'obturation (46) entre une position de fermeture, dans laquelle il arrête la décharge de la trémie (14), et une position d'ouverture, dans laquelle il permet l'écoulement de la matière à travers le siège principal (16). Le clapet comprend en outre un écran (28) de réduction de la section de passage du siège principal (16) et un mécanisme d'entraînement apte à entraîner l'écran (28) entre une première position, dans laquelle l'écran (28) est associé au siège principal (16) de façon à réduire la section de passage de celui-ci, et une deuxième position, dans laquelle il libère entièrement la section de passage du siège principal (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 1/20; B65D 90/62; B65D 90/64; F27D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/62 (2006.01); B65D 90/64 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01); F27D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/64 (2013.01); B65D 90/623 (2013.01); F27D 3/0033 (2013.01); F27D 3/10 (2013.01); F27D 2003/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997698 A1 20000503; CN 1253272 A 20000517; LU 90308 A1 20000719; TW 402678 B 20000821

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI