Global Patent Index - EP 0997775 A2

EP 0997775 A2 2000-05-03 - Photographic colour silver halide material

Title (en)

Photographic colour silver halide material

Title (de)

Farbfotografisches Silberhalogenidmaterial

Title (fr)

Matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent

Publication

EP 0997775 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120063 A

Priority

  • DE 19850073 A
  • DE 19914881 A

Abstract (en)

A multi layer, negative-working color photographic material in which at least 95 mol.% of the Ag halide is AgCl is such that at least one of the Ag halide emulsion layers shows solarisation on analog illumination (i.e. the color density decreases: (A) with increasing illumination intensity at constant illumination time; or (B) with increasing illumination time at constant illumination intensity). The material is one containing Ag halide emulsion layers which comprise at least one blue-sensitive layer containing a yellow coupler, at least one green-sensitive layer containing a magenta coupler and at least one red-sensitive layer containing a blue-green coupler.

Abstract (de)

Ein farbfotografisches, negativ entwickelndes Silberhalogenidmaterial mit einem Träger und wenigstens einer blauempfindlichen, wenigstens einen Gelbkuppler enthaltenden Silberhalogenidemulsionsschicht, wenigstens einer grünempfindlichen, wenigstens einen Purpurkuppler enthaltenden Silberhalogenidemulsionsschicht und wenigstens einer rotempfindlichen, wenigstens einen Blaugrünkuppler enthaltenden Silberhalogenidemulsionsschicht, deren Silberhalogenide zu wenigstens 95 mol-% aus AgCl bestehen und bei dem mindestens eine Silberhalogenidemulsionsschicht bei Analogbelichtung Solarisation aufweist, zeichnet sich bei scannender Belichtung durch hohe Farbdichte und bei Analogbelichtung durch einen von der Belichtungszeit unabhängigen Kontrast aus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/08 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 7/30 (2006.01); G03C 1/09 (2006.01); G03C 7/305 (2006.01); G03C 7/34 (2006.01); G03C 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/3022 (2013.01); G03C 1/09 (2013.01); G03C 7/30535 (2013.01); G03C 7/346 (2013.01); G03C 7/383 (2013.01); G03C 7/3835 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 1/09 + G03C 2001/092 + G03C 2001/093 + G03C 2001/094
  2. G03C 7/3022 + G03C 2001/03517 + G03C 2001/03535 + G03C 1/08

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997775 A2 20000503; EP 0997775 A3 20000607; EP 0997775 B1 20011010; JP 2000137315 A 20000516; US 6194135 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051019

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2005-10-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051019

2004-10-13 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-09-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040927

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031013

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-01-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011224

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900302 20011115

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-10-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-10-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI