Global patent index - EP 0997805 A2

EP 0997805 A2 2000-05-03 - Foot pedal

Title (en)

Foot pedal

Title (de)

Fusspedal

Title (fr)

Pédale

Publication

EP 0997805 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99306772 A

Priority

GB 9823849 A

Abstract (en)

A foot pedal for operating a mechanism of a vehicle, comprising a first generally elongate member (40,42) having a foot plate (38) at one end and being adapted for pivotable mounting on the vehicle generally at its other end and a second generally elongate member (44) extending from the first member (40,42), the second member (44) being adapted generally at its distal end for pivotable mounting on the vehicle at a position spaced apart along a common axis from the pivotably mountable end of the first member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/30 (2008.04); G05G 1/46 (2008.04)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/30 (2013.01); G05G 1/46 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997805 A2 20000503; EP 0997805 A3 20020109; GB 2343238 A 20000503; GB 9823849 D0 19981223

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI