Global Patent Index - EP 0997806 A1

EP 0997806 A1 2000-05-03 - Method for the correlation of non-binary images and device for carrying out said method

Title (en)

Method for the correlation of non-binary images and device for carrying out said method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Korrelation von nicht-binären Bildern und Vorrichtung zu dessen Durchführung

Title (fr)

Procédé de corrélation d'images non binaires et dispositif de mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 0997806 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402707 A

Priority

FR 9813668 A

Abstract (en)

The image correlation is applied to digital images (I) with each pixel coded using N bits. Each image in the scene and in the reference image is pre-processed by transforming the N bits of each pixel into at least N binary pixels, forming a transformed image (F) from these binary pixels, and correlating the corresponding transformed images.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé de l'invention est un procédé de corrélation d'images de scènes non binaires avec des images de référence sans perte d'information, appliqué à des images numérisées (I) dont chaque pixel est codé sur N bits, et il est caractérisé en ce qu'il consiste à effectuer un pré-traitement de chacune des images de scène et de référence, pré-traitement selon lequel on transforme les N bits de chaque pixel de chaque image en au moins N pixels binaires, à constituer une image transformée (F) à partir de ces pixels binaires et à corréler les images transformées correspondantes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06E 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06E 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06E 3/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5040140 A 19910813 - HORNER JOSEPH L [US]
  • [Y] STOFFEL J C ET AL: "A SURVEY OF ELECTRONIC TECHNIQUES FOR PICTORIAL IMAGE REPRODUCTION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 29, no. 12, 1 December 1981 (1981-12-01), pages 1898 - 1925, XP000560531

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997806 A1 20000503; FR 2785420 A1 20000505

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI