Global Patent Index - EP 0997866 A2

EP 0997866 A2 2000-05-03 - Information display system

Title (en)

Information display system

Title (de)

Informationanzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage d'informations

Publication

EP 0997866 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99250383 A

Priority

  • US 18299898 A
  • US 18302398 A
  • US 18302198 A

Abstract (en)

An information display system is disclosed. A work environment providing a work area and a workstation including the information display system are also disclosed. The information display system includes a track system adapted to attach to a mounting structure and a plurality of display panels coupled to the track system for movement with respect to the mounting structure. The display panels are adapted to present information selectively for display by pivotal and translating movement of the plurality of display panels. The track system may include at least one rail. The display panels may be cantilevered away from the track system at a vertical elevation to provide clearance below the display panels for a seated worker. The information display system may include a plurality of containers coupled to the track system for movement with respect to the mounting structure, with each of the plurality of containers is adapted to include at least one display panel. Each of the display panels is adapted to present information and the information can selectively be presented for display by movement of the plurality of containers. Each of the display panels may include at least one display board. A docking area may be positioned along the track system and configured to at least partially conceal at least one of the display panels. A utility threshold may be adapted for movement along a predefined path about the work area to selectively deliver utilities to at least one portion of the work area. The work environment may provide a work space that can be arranged or divided to include at least one work area within the available floor space. In the work area, the display panels may be moved from a first arrangement to at least a second arrangement. The first arrangement allows one worker to use substantially all available floor space; the second arrangement allows a plurality of workers to share the available floor space so as to facilitate the utilization of the floor space by workers present in the work environment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/18 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01); G09F 7/08 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/00 (2013.01); G09F 7/08 (2013.01); G09F 15/0068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997866 A2 20000503; EP 0997866 A3 20001206; EP 0997866 B1 20061011; BR 9907423 A 20000905; CA 2287875 A1 20000430; DE 69933521 D1 20061123; DE 69933521 T2 20070816; JP 2000172180 A 20000623

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071009

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69933521 P 20061123

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010406

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI