Global patent index - EP 0997914 A2

EP 0997914 A2 2000-05-03 - Electrical coil, especially for heating

Title (en)

Electrical coil, especially for heating

Title (de)

Elektrische Drahtwicklung, insbesondere Heizdrahtwicklung

Title (fr)

Bobinage électrique, notamment pour chauffage

Publication

EP 0997914 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119945 A

Priority

DE 19849683 A

Abstract (en)

The winding has a wire wound around a carrier body (43), like a screw. The carrier body has spacer grooves, into which the turns of the wire fit. The carrier body has a rectangular, preferably square cross-section, whose long edges have indentations to act as the spacer grooves. The coil forms a cylindrical surface, whose diameter corresponds to the inner surface of the indentations.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine elektrische Drahtwicklung, insbesondere Heizdrahtwicklung, bei der der Draht zu einer Spiralfederform um einen Trägerkörper gewickelt ist. Der Trägerkörper weist daran angepaßte Nuten auf, in die die einzelnen Windungen eingreifen. Der Trägerkörper (43; 50) aus Isolierstoff ist zweigeteilt und zwischen den Teilen (20, 21; 51, 52) ist eine diese auseinanderdrückende Federanordnung (22, 55) eingesetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 1/016

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/016 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997914 A2 20000503; EP 0997914 A3 20031008; EP 0997914 B1 20050420; DE 19849683 A1 20000504

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121011

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI