Global Patent Index - EP 0997915 A3

EP 0997915 A3 2000-06-21 - Flat-paticle iron powder, method for making the same and powder magnetic core using the same

Title (en)

Flat-paticle iron powder, method for making the same and powder magnetic core using the same

Title (de)

Eisenpulver von flächen Teilchen, Herstellungsverfahren und magnetische Pulverkern davon

Title (fr)

Poudre de fer en particules planes, méthode de fabrication et noyau magnétique en poudre de cela

Publication

EP 0997915 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99119376 A

Priority

JP 27787898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0997915A2] A flat-particle iron powder, composed of reduced iron powder obtained by reducing iron oxide, has an average aspect ratio of at least 5 and an average ferrite grain size of 2 to 20 mu m, is preferably used for a powder magnetic core, has high permeability over a higher frequency region, and is covered with a compound having an amine-quinone-repeating unit to further improve its magnetic characteristics. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/20; H01F 1/24; H01F 3/08; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/20 (2006.01); H01F 1/24 (2006.01); H01F 3/08 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/0246 (2013.01); H01F 1/20 (2013.01); H01F 1/24 (2013.01); H01F 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997915 A2 20000503; EP 0997915 A3 20000621; CA 2284139 A1 20000330

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20011018

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE SE

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01F 1/20 A, 7H 01F 1/24 B, 7H 01F 3/08 B, 7H 01F 41/02 B, 7H 01F 1/22 B, 7H 01F 1/26 B

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI