Global Patent Index - EP 0997916 A1

EP 0997916 A1 2000-05-03 - Electromagnet with heat transfer body

Title (en)

Electromagnet with heat transfer body

Title (de)

Elektromagnet mit Wärmeableitkörper

Title (fr)

Electro-aimant avec corps dissipateur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0997916 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119999 A

Priority

DE 19849588 A

Abstract (en)

The electromagnet (1) has a coil (3) surrounded by at least two outer metal surfaces (5). A heat sink (2) at least partially grips around at least one of outer surfaces, serving for heat transport (8,9) of the electromagnet. The heat sink has two limbs (6) each with an inner surface (10), which is positioned on a large area of one of the outer metal surfaces. The heat sink is preferably U-shaped and the electromagnet is installed in a housing (11) of an electric switching device, especially a position switch.

Abstract (de)

Erfindungsgemäß wird der Elektromagnet (1) mit einem Wärmeableitkörper (2) versehen, der mit zwei Schenkeln großflächig an zwei die Spule (3) umgebenden Metallaußenflächen (5) anliegt und mindestens eine zum Wärmetransport dienende Außenfläche (8,9) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997916 A1 20000503; EP 0997916 B1 20040414; DE 19849588 C1 20001123

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101014

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909158 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030513

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI