Global patent index - EP 0997919 A1

EP 0997919 A1 2000-05-03 - Switching device having a mechanical signaling element with three positions

Title (en)

Switching device having a mechanical signaling element with three positions

Title (de)

Schaltvorrichtung mit einem mechanischen Dreistellungsanzeigeorgan

Title (fr)

Appareillage de coupure comportant un organe mécanique de visualisation à trois positions

Publication

EP 0997919 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410124 A

Priority

FR 9813881 A

Abstract (en)

Circuit breaker includes visible status indicator. The electrical cut-out switch (12) comprises contacts which are biased towards their open position by a spring, and an arming mechanism with an energy store and mechanical contact opening and closing drive chain, linked to the energy store. The mechanism is operated by an opening bolt (64) and a closing bolt (70). The instruction to close the contacts may only be validly transmitted to the closing bolt (70) when the mechanism is in the ready to close state. The switch includes a three-position indicator. The positions include a non-armed position, a ready to close position, and a third position which is armed and not ready to close. The indicator is mechanically linked to the arming mechanism, to the opening bolt, and to the contact components.

Abstract (fr)

Un appareillage de coupure 12 comporte des organes de contacts rappelés vers une position d'ouverture par un ressort, un mécanisme d'armement d'un accumulateur d'énergie et une chaîne cinématique d'ouverture et de fermeture reliant l'accumulateur d'énergie, les organes de contact et le ressort. Cette chaîne est pilotée par un verrou d'ouverture 64 et un verrou de fermeture 70. Un ordre de fermeture ne peut être valablement transmis au verrou de fermeture 70 que lorsque l'appareillage est dans un état « prêt à fermer », c'est-à-dire ouvert, armé et sans ordre permanent d'ouverture. L'appareillage comporte un voyant 30 à trois positions : une position « non armé », une position « prêt à fermer » et une troisième position « armé et non prêt à fermer » ou « armé débrayé ». Ce voyant 30 est lié cinématiquement au mécanisme d'armement, au verrou d'ouverture 64, et aux organes de contact. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/40 (2006.01); H01H 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/30 (2013.01); H01H 3/3015 (2013.01); H01H 2003/3073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997919 A1 20000503; EP 0997919 B1 20060215; AU 5714199 A 20000504; AU 754416 B2 20021114; BR 9904986 A 20000905; BR 9904986 B1 20130910; CA 2283991 A1 20000430; CA 2283991 C 20080513; CN 1103489 C 20030319; CN 1253366 A 20000517; CZ 298125 B6 20070627; CZ 9903822 A3 20000712; DE 69929873 D1 20060420; DE 69929873 T2 20060907; EA 001841 B1 20010827; EA 199900885 A2 20000626; EA 199900885 A3 20000828; ES 2258320 T3 20060816; FR 2785444 A1 20000505; FR 2785444 B1 20001215; HU 9903981 A2 20000828; HU 9903981 A3 20000928; HU 9903981 D0 20000128; ID 25949 A 20001116; JP 2000149726 A 20000530; JP 4454734 B2 20100421; KR 100695635 B1 20070315; KR 20000029413 A 20000525; PL 194955 B1 20070731; PL 336036 A1 20000508; TR 9902695 A2 20000721; TR 9902695 A3 20000721; TW 434623 B 20010516; US 6144002 A 20001107; ZA 9906752 B 20000502

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151006

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150915

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150501

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131010

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2258320

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060502

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69929873

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2006-02-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060215

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT NL

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000624

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI