Global Patent Index - EP 0997921 A1

EP 0997921 A1 2000-05-03 - Method and device for control of a electromechanical relay

Title (en)

Method and device for control of a electromechanical relay

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Steuerung eines elektromechanischen Relais

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de commande pour un relais électromécanique

Publication

EP 0997921 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119944 A

Priority

DE 19849684 A

Abstract (en)

The control method involves driving the relay's coil (4) with an electronic drive unit (5). The AC voltage null crossings are detected, with subsequent detection of a current pulse occurring when the load is switched on. The relay coil is driven after a delay following the last null crossing, after entering a switching command to the drive unit. An estimated delay is defined for initialization and incrementing or decrementing the delay, for subsequent cycles, depending on the sign of the current pulse to switch the relay (3) closer to the null crossing time. An Independent claim is also included for an electromechanical relay.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren und eine Einrichtung zur Steuerung eines an einem Wechselspannungsnetz betriebenen und einen Laststrom schaltenden elektromechanischen Relais (3). Zur Vermeidung eines hohen Anlaufstroms, insbesondere bei kapazitiver oder Glühlampenlast, wird mittels einer Erfassung des jeweiligen Nulldurchgangs (6) der Netzwechselspannung, des nach dem Einschalten einer Last (1) auftretenden Anlaufstromimpulses (dI) mittels eines Detektors (7) und einer Meßeinrichtung (8), sowie mittels einer elektronischen Ansteuereinheit (5) nach Zuführung eines Schaltbefehls dieser um eine solche Verzögerungsdauer (T) verzögert zur Relaisspule (4) geführt, daß der Relaiskontakt (2) zum Zeitpunkt eines Nulldurchgangs (t0) schließt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 47/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/56 (2013.01); H01H 2009/566 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997921 A1 20000503; EP 0997921 B1 20011212; DE 19849684 A1 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180501

2018-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900531

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900531 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI