Global Patent Index - EP 0997958 A1

EP 0997958 A1 2000-05-03 - A space saving mobile device

Title (en)

A space saving mobile device

Title (de)

Raumsparende mobile Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif mobile à encombrement réduit

Publication

EP 0997958 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119493 A

Priority

FI 982344 A

Abstract (en)

A mobile device 20 in which, in order to make the device thinner, at least one of the walls belonging to its structure (23, 26) has for a part of its area been made of thin plastic foil in order to reduce the thickness of the device. The same plastic foil also facilitates the printing of the product markings on it, e.g. by using laser-marking, prior to fixing the plastic foil in place. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 10/12; G06F 1/16; H04M 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 5/02 (2006.01); G06F 1/16 (2006.01); H01M 2/02 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/1616 (2013.01); G06F 1/1635 (2013.01); G06F 1/1656 (2013.01); H01M 2/0267 (2013.01); H01M 2/0275 (2013.01); H01M 2/0277 (2013.01); H04M 1/0202 (2013.01); H01M 2/0287 (2013.01); H04M 1/72519 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997958 A1 20000503; FI 982344 A0 19981028; FI 982344 A 20000429; JP 2000138468 A 20000516; US 6304430 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040331

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI