Global Patent Index - EP 0997965 A1

EP 0997965 A1 2000-05-03 - Wilkinson power divider circuit and corresponding design method

Title (en)

Wilkinson power divider circuit and corresponding design method

Title (de)

Wilkinson-Leistungsverteilerschaltung und entsprechendes Entwurfsverfahren

Title (fr)

Circuit diviseur de puissance Wilkinson et sa méthode de conception

Publication

EP 0997965 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98120556 A

Priority

EP 98120556 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a a Wilkinson power divider circuit, comprising a plurality of N transmission lines (TRL1, TRL2, ..., TRLN), N being an integer equal to or greater than 2, having a respective length of 1 = lambda 0/4 at a center frequency f0 , where lambda 0 is the wavelength at f0, and respective line impedances Zw; said plurality of N transmission lines (TRL1, TRL2, ..., TRLN) being connected to a first port (P1) at a respective first end, to a respective second port (P2, P3, ..., PN+1) at a respective second end, and via a respective resistor (R1, ..., RN) to a node (O) at the respective second end. By means of an additional LC circuit (50) comprising at least an inductor having an inductance L and a capacitor having a capacitance C connected in series between said first port (P1) and said first ends of said plurality of N transmission lines (TRL1, TRL2, ..., TRLN) having its resonance frequency fr at or near said center frequency fo, it is possible to broaden the bandwith at a desired value of the minimum isolation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2282008 A 19950322 - HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 121 (E - 068) 5 August 1981 (1981-08-05)
  • [Y] A.A.M. SALEH: "PLANAR ELECTRICALLY SYMMETRIC N-WAY HYBRID POWER DIVIDERS/COMBINERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES., vol. 28, no. 6, June 1980 (1980-06-01), NEW YORK US, pages 555 - 563, XP002095839

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0997965 A1 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FI FR GB SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI