Global Patent Index - EP 0997981 A2

EP 0997981 A2 2000-05-03 - Terminals for side by side mounting

Title (en)

Terminals for side by side mounting

Title (de)

Reihenklemme

Title (fr)

Bornes pour montage en ligne

Publication

EP 0997981 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119998 A

Priority

DE 29819160 U

Abstract (en)

The series clamp (1) has outer contacts (7) to rest on a standard section guide having a base carrier. The base carrier has three parallel conductors, isolated from each other and having conductive contactable surfaces. The base carrier has an earth potential line (11) with screening (12) and a signal line (9). The series clamp has a fixed component (4) to contact the ground potential line (11) and the screening. A moveable component (5) is provided to contact the signal line. The moveable component (5) is formed so that it contacts a first signal line resting on the standard section guide. A movable component of a second series clamp, when supported on the standard section guide, contacts a second signal line directly next to the first clamp (1). A short circuit bridge (8) connects the components (4,5) with outer contacts (7,8) and has a power amplifier, relay or thyristor.

Abstract (de)

Reihenklemme (1) mit Außenkontakten (7) zum Aufrasten auf eine Normprofilschiene (16), in welcher ein Grundträger (10) vorgesehen ist, der mindestens drei parallel zueinander verlaufende Leiterbahnen (9, 11, 12) aufweist, die gegeneinander isoliert sind, deren Oberfläche jedoch elektrisch leitend kontaktierbar ist, wobei im Grundträger (10) insbesondere eine Massepotential führende Massepotentialleiterbahn (11), eine Schirmleiterbahn (12) zur Schirmableitung und Signalleiterbahnen (9) zur Signalweiterleitung vorgesehen sind und wobei die Reihenklemme (1) jeweils einen ortsfesten Abnehmer (4) zur Kontaktierung der Massepotentialleiterbahn (11) und der Schirmleiterbahn (12) und einen beweglichen Abnehmer (5) zur Kontaktierung einer Signalleiterbahn (9) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2691 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819160 U1 19990107; EP 0997981 A2 20000503; EP 0997981 A3 20020130

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110503

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/28 A

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI