Global Patent Index - EP 0998169 A2

EP 0998169 A2 2000-05-03 - Cooking hob

Title (en)

Cooking hob

Title (de)

Kochmulde

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson

Publication

EP 0998169 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119589 A

Priority

DE 19849136 A

Abstract (en)

The cooking hob (1) has a ceramic glass hob surface (2) with a number of cooking zones provided with respective radiation heating elements (5,6), each enclosed by a body (7,8) of a heat insulation material, pressed against the rear of the hob surface, via an elastic and/or plastic element (10) between the heat insulation body and a heat insulation layer (9), inserted between the radiation heatig elements and the dished base (3) of the cooking hob.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kochmulde weist eine Abdeckplatte 2 und einen mit dieser verbundenen Muldenboden 3 für mehrere Kochstellen auf. Jeder Kochstelle ist ein Strahlungsheizelement 5,6 zugeordnet, das von einem Umgrenzungskörper 7,8 umgeben ist. Für einen Bauhöhen-Toleranzausgleich bei flacher Bauweise sind Ausgleichselemente 10 zwischen der Isolierlage 9 und den Umgrenzungskörpern 7,8 angeordnet, die sich an der Isolierlage 9 abstützen und die Umgrenzungskörper 7,8 gegen die Abdeckplatte 2 drücken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/74; F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/104 (2013.01); H05B 3/748 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19849136 A1 20000427; EP 0998169 A2 20000503; EP 0998169 A3 20010627

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG & CO. KG

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI