Global Patent Index - EP 0998178 A1

EP 0998178 A1 2000-05-03 - Device for fixing a jack connector on a mobile phone circuit board

Title (en)

Device for fixing a jack connector on a mobile phone circuit board

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Befestigung eines Jackverbinders auf der gedruckten Leiterplatte eines Mobiltelefons

Title (fr)

Dispositif permettant de fixer un jack sur un circuit imprimé de téléphone mobile

Publication

EP 0998178 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402566 A

Priority

FR 9813688 A

Abstract (en)

The spring contact provides both mechanical support and electrical connection for the jack socket The retaining element comprises a component (3) cut from sheet metal and folded into a U-shape. The U-shaped extends around a channel (4) formed around three sides of the insulating body (1) of the jack plug base. Each side of the U comprises a fin which extends around the insulating body and down towards the surface of the printed circuit board. Each side ends in a folded foot (8) which is attached to the printed circuit board. The central section of the sheet metal element includes a projecting lamella (10) which has a folded section (15). This folded part is intended to fit into a corresponding recess (2) formed in the insulating base.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif permet de positionner et de fixer d'une part une embase pour un jack (1) audio et stéréo sur le circuit imprimé d'un téléphone mobile et d'autre part permet un contact électrique avec une partie de contact (2) de ce jack. Il consiste en un élément (3) découpé dans une feuille métallique et plié en forme de U, ce U étant engagé dans une gorge (4) s'étendant sur la face supérieure du corps isolant de l'embase du jack (1) et sur chacun des deux côtés (6) de ce corps, les deux ailes (7) dudit U comportant chacune à son extrémité une patte (8) pliée à angle droit vers l'extérieur et destinée à être fixée sur le circuit imprimé, la base (9) du U dudit élément (3) portant une lame (10) en contact élastique avec une partie de contact (2) du jack (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05K 7/12; H01R 12/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/73 (2006.01); H01R 9/16 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/58 (2013.01); H01R 12/7047 (2013.01); H01R 12/707 (2013.01); H01R 13/65802 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0810695 A1 19971203 - ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 97, no. 1 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 96, no. 7 31 July 1996 (1996-07-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0998178 A1 20000503; FR 2785455 A1 20000505; FR 2785455 B1 20010126; JP 2000164303 A 20000616

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040503

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI