Global Patent Index - EP 0998195 A2

EP 0998195 A2 2000-05-10 - DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING FEED TO DOMESTIC ANIMALS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING FEED TO DOMESTIC ANIMALS

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON NAHRUNGSMITTEL FÜR HAUSTIERE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LA DISTRIBUTION DE NOURRITURE A DES ANIMAUX DOMESTIQUES

Publication

EP 0998195 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98929423 A

Priority

  • DE 19724550 A
  • EP 9803375 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19724550A1] The invention relates to a device for supplying feed to domestic animals, especially calves or lambs, comprising a feed supply outlet (15.1 to 15.3), especially a dish for liquids or a sucking point, and at least one feed source (10.1 to 10.4). Said device is characterized in that a buffer element (1) is positioned between the at least one feed source (10.1 to 10.4) and the feed supply outlet (15.1 to 15.2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 9/00; A01K 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 5/02 (2006.01); A01K 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 9/00 (2013.01); A01K 5/0216 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9856242A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19724550 A1 19981217; AU 7918598 A 19981230; EP 0998195 A2 20000510; EP 1093717 A2 20010425; EP 1093717 A3 20010905; EP 1093717 B1 20021218; EP 1093718 A2 20010425; EP 1093718 A3 20010509; EP 1093718 B1 20021218; WO 9856242 A2 19981217; WO 9856242 A3 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19991016

2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010823

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-07-26 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991016

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL