Global patent index - EP 0998208 A1

EP 0998208 A1 2000-05-10 - STRETCHED FASTENERS

Title (en)

STRETCHED FASTENERS

Title (de)

AUSGEDEHNTER VERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

FIXATIONS ALLONGEES

Publication

EP 0998208 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98904652 A

Priority

  • US 9801271 W
  • US 78963797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9832349A1] A running length of fastener product (10) is formed of longitudinally pre-oriented synthetic resin. The product is characterized by a base web and an array of discrete fastener elements (A) protruding from at least one side of the web (12) being in a laterally stretched molecular oriented condition. After forming a preform having discrete fastener elements (11) integral with a base web (12) in a stretchable state, the preform is stretched in a manner that substantially increases the fastener element spacing and reduces the thickness of the base web (12). A machine (40) is shown that is capable of lengthwise orienting before forming and widthwise stretching after forming, which employs controlled heating to render the product widthwise stretchable while preserving or achieving a desired shape of the fastener elements (11). There are shown fastener products (10) that include products that are laterally stretched to between two and ten times the width of the original preform fastener products (10), having lateral rip resistance due to molecular orientation of film form webs (12) produced by stretching, applied to complex or extensive surfaces. Also shown are laminated products formed by joining an added material to the stretched web (12), and methods for laminating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 18/00; B29C 47/00; B29D 5/00; D06C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/00 (2006.01); B29D 5/00 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01); D06C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/0003 (2013.01); A44B 18/0049 (2013.01); A44B 18/0061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9832349 A1 19980730; AU 6247898 A 19980818; CN 1254258 A 20000524; CN 1309328 C 20070411; DE 69824180 D1 20040701; DE 69824180 T2 20050602; EP 0998208 A1 20000510; EP 0998208 A4 20000510; EP 0998208 B1 20040526; JP 2002510986 A 20020409; KR 20000070504 A 20001125

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050123

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-05-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050123

2004-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69824180

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021022

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990826

2000-05-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT