Global Patent Index - EP 0998282 A4

EP 0998282 A4 2000-08-30 - SULFONAMIDES AS CELL ADHESION INHIBITORS

Title (en)

SULFONAMIDES AS CELL ADHESION INHIBITORS

Title (de)

SULFONAMIDEN ALS ZELLADHÄSIONSHEMMERN

Title (fr)

SULFAMIDES UTILISES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE L'ADHERENCE CELLULAIRE

Publication

EP 0998282 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98924989 A

Priority

  • GB 9714335 A
  • GB 9800684 A
  • US 9810952 W
  • US 4795497 P
  • US 6678797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853818A1] Compounds of formula (I) are antagonists of VLA-4 and/or alpha 4- beta 7, and as such are useful in the inhibition or prevention of cell adhesion and cell-adhesion mediated pathologies. These compounds may be formulated into pharmaceutical compositions and are suitable for use in the treatment of asthma, allergies, inflammation, multiple sclerosis, and other inflammatory and autoimmune disorders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/42; A61K 31/415; A61K 31/425; A61K 31/505; C07C 255/03; C07D 207/08; C07D 217/18; C07D 231/04; C07D 263/04; C07D 277/04; C07D 285/12; C07D 295/023; C07D 413/10; C07D 417/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/18 (2006.01); A61K 38/05 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C07K 5/065 (2006.01); C07K 5/072 (2006.01); C07K 5/078 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/06191 (2013.01); A61K 38/05 (2013.01); C07K 5/06026 (2013.01); C07K 5/06034 (2013.01); C07K 5/06052 (2013.01); C07K 5/06078 (2013.01); C07K 5/06113 (2013.01); C07K 5/06139 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853818 A1 19981203; AU 728435 B2 20010111; AU 7703298 A 19981230; CA 2291708 A1 19981203; EP 0998282 A1 20000510; EP 0998282 A4 20000830; JP 2002501537 A 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050920

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERCK & CO., INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/42 A

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/415 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/425 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/505 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07C 255/03 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 207/08 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 217/18 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 231/04 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 263/04 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 277/04 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 285/12 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 295/023 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 413/10 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 417/10 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 9/10 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 11/00 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 11/06 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 21/00 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 29/00 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 43/00 B

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030515

2000-08-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991229

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE