Global Patent Index - EP 0998293 A1

EP 0998293 A1 2000-05-10 - CYTOKINE RELATED TREATMENTS OF DISEASE

Title (en)

CYTOKINE RELATED TREATMENTS OF DISEASE

Title (de)

BEHANDLUNGEN VON ZYTOKIN-BEDINGTEN KRANKHEITEN

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENTS LIES A LA CYTOKINE DESTINES A DES AFFECTIONS

Publication

EP 0998293 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98903474 A

Priority

  • US 9800634 W
  • US 3609497 P
  • US 2858697 P
  • US 4397497 P
  • US 5548797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9830223A1] Nucleosides and other compounds to selectively modulate Th1 and Th2 responses relative to each other in the treatment of disease. In one aspect of the invention, administration of a nucleoside or other compound reduces the dosage at which a primary drug is administered. In another aspect of the invention, an abnormality reflected in increased response in one group of cytokines is treated by administering a nucleoside or other compound which increases response in another group of cytokines. In yet another aspect of the invention, a patient is prophylactically treated by administering a nucleoside or other compound which selectively reduces Th1 activity without significantly reducing Th2 activity. In yet another aspect of the invention, a nucleoside or other compound is administered to a patient at a dose which reduces the patient's GTP pool to a degree that selectively reduces one of the Th1 or Th2 response without significantly reducing the other response. Controlled release dosage forms are particularly contemplated to achieve that result.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 19/167 (2006.01); A61K 31/52 (2006.01); A61K 31/522 (2006.01); A61K 31/56 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7042 (2006.01); A61K 31/7052 (2006.01); A61K 31/7056 (2006.01); A61K 31/7076 (2006.01); A61K 31/708 (2006.01); A61K 31/7115 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07H 19/00 (2006.01); C07H 19/04 (2006.01); C07H 19/052 (2006.01); C07H 19/056 (2006.01); C07H 19/16 (2006.01); C07H 19/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 19/16 (2013.01); A61K 31/52 (2013.01); A61K 31/522 (2013.01); A61K 31/70 (2013.01); A61K 31/7056 (2013.01); A61K 31/7076 (2013.01); A61K 31/7115 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); C07H 19/00 (2013.01); C07H 19/04 (2013.01); C07H 19/052 (2013.01); C07H 19/056 (2013.01); C07H 19/24 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 45/06 + A61K 45/06

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9830223 A1 19980716; AU 6023898 A 19980803; AU 736075 B2 20010726; BR 9807473 A 20000321; CA 2278158 A1 19980716; CN 1253504 A 20000517; CN 1289594 A 20010404; CN 1312254 A 20010912; EP 0998293 A1 20000510; EP 0998293 A4 20020717; HU 0001526 A2 20010528; HU 0001526 A3 20021028; IL 130497 D0 20000601; JP 2002080490 A 20020319; JP 2002515892 A 20020528; JP 2004035546 A 20040205; NO 20004327 A 19990913; NO 20004327 D0 20000831; NO 20004329 A 19990913; NO 20004329 D0 20000831; NO 993439 A 19990913; NO 993439 D0 19990713; PL 336579 A1 20000703; SI 9820003 A 19990630; SK 94099 A3 20010611; YU 61598 A 20030228

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025245

2004-12-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RIBAPHARM, INC.

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-07-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/70 A, 7A 61K 45/06 B, 7C 07H 19/00 B, 7C 07H 19/16 B

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981130

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE