Global Patent Index - EP 0998297 A2

EP 0998297 A2 2000-05-10 - IMPROVED DELIVERY OF DISEASE MODIFIERS

Title (en)

IMPROVED DELIVERY OF DISEASE MODIFIERS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE FREISETZUNG VON ARZNEIMITTELN

Title (fr)

ADMINISTRATION AMELIOREE DE MODIFICATEURS DE PATHOLOGIES

Publication

EP 0998297 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98920426 A

Priority

  • CA 9800448 W
  • CA 2205771 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852590A2] A pharmaceutical composition component comprising hyaluronan binding motif (HBM) interposed between a form of hyaluronan having a molecular weight (protein standard) less than 750'000 daltons and a disease modifier which comprises a peptide or protein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/66 (2017.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/19 (2013.01); A61K 47/62 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852590 A2 19981126; WO 9852590 A3 19990422; AU 7328698 A 19981211; AU 740631 B2 20011108; CA 2205771 A1 19981122; CA 2205771 C 20020514; EP 0998297 A2 20000510; JP 2001526666 A 20011218; NZ 501270 A 20010831

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021219

2000-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAGOTEC AG

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAGOTEC AG

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991207

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE