Global Patent Index - EP 0998354 A1

EP 0998354 A1 2000-05-10 - METHOD FOR CLEANING ELECTROTILTERS AND ELECTROFILTERS WITH A CLEANING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CLEANING ELECTROTILTERS AND ELECTROFILTERS WITH A CLEANING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN VON ELEKTROFILTERN UND ELEKTROFILTER MIT REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE D'ELECTROFILTRES ET ELECTROFILTRE DOTE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 0998354 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99952079 A

Priority

  • DE 9901071 W
  • DE 19822332 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822332C1] The invention relates to a method for cleaning the emission electrode of an electrofilter, whereby a cleaning body moves along along the emission electrode and strips it. The electrofilter is used in an internal combustion engine. According to the inventive method, only the first stage of the two-stage electrode is cleaned, whereby said first stage has an open end and is formed in the corona.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/41 (2006.01); B03C 3/74 (2006.01); F01M 11/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/743 (2013.01); F01M 11/03 (2013.01); F01M 2001/1021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959724A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822332 C1 19990527; BR 9906461 A 20000926; EP 0998354 A1 20000510; EP 0998354 B1 20041103; JP 2002515331 A 20020528; JP 4404482 B2 20100127; US 6348103 B1 20020219; WO 9959724 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100404

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041103

2005-02-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910982 P 20041209

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENGST GMBH & CO. KG

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991211

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE