Global patent index - EP 0998361 A1

EP 0998361 A1 2000-05-10 - TURBINE BLADE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TURBINE BLADE

Title (en)

TURBINE BLADE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TURBINE BLADE

Title (de)

TURBINENSCHAUFEL SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER TURBINENSCHAUFEL

Title (fr)

AUBE DE TURBINE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0998361 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943748 A

Priority

  • EP 98943748 A
  • EP 9804529 W
  • EP 97113044 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894558A1] The turbine blade extends along a main axis (2) from a foot region (3) to a head region (5), with the intermediate blade region (4) incorporating at least one hollow space (6), enclosed by a turbine wall section with a reduced thickness. The turbine wall is made of a metallic material (8) with a lesser mean particle size than a conventional cast metal. The thickness of the turbine wall may reduce continuously in the direction of the head region.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); B22C 9/04 (2006.01); B22C 9/24 (2006.01); B22D 21/00 (2006.01); B22D 27/04 (2006.01); F01D 5/28 (2006.01); F01D 9/02 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/04 (2013.01); B22D 27/045 (2013.01); Y10S 415/915 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906166A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894558 A1 19990203; DE 59805830 D1 20021107; EP 0998361 A1 20000510; EP 0998361 B1 20021002; JP 2003520313 A 20030702; US 6257828 B1 20010710; WO 9906166 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59805830

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100720

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090918

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090713

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2004-07-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805830

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-07

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: TURBINE BLADE AND USE OF A KNOWN METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A TURBINE BLADE

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI