Global Patent Index - EP 0998373 B1

EP 0998373 B1 2000-12-27 - CLAMPING TOOL, ESPECIALLY A CLAMPING CLIP, CLAMPING ROD OR CLAMPING BENCH

Title (en)

CLAMPING TOOL, ESPECIALLY A CLAMPING CLIP, CLAMPING ROD OR CLAMPING BENCH

Title (de)

SPANNWERKZEUG, INSBESONDERE SPANNZWINGE, SPANNSTOCK ODER SPANNTISCH

Title (fr)

OUTIL DE SERRAGE, EN PARTICULIER SERRE-JOINT, BLOC DE SERRAGE OU TABLE DE SERRAGE

Publication

EP 0998373 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98940087 A

Priority

  • DE 19731579 A
  • EP 9803915 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19731579A1] The invention relates to a clamping tool, especially a clamping clip with a clamping area between a first mobile clamping jaw (1) which rests at the end of a pull or slide rod and a fixed second clamping jaw (2) which rests on a housing. The inventive clamping tool also comprises a pivoting handle (10). Said handle (10) is located opposite the fixed clamping jaw (2) in relation to the longitudinal extension of the pull rod and next to a grip situated on the housing side. As the handle (10) is displaced against the grip, the pull rod is displaced progressively in such a way that the first mobile clamping jaw is moved towards the second fixed clamping jaw, any back pressure being locked. The clamping tool also has a release lever for releasing the back pressure lock. This release lever rests on the housing. In order to increase the scope of application of the inventive clamping clip, both the handle (10) and the release lever (15) are located on the side of the grip (33) facing away from the clamping area (1, 2), the lever transmission ratios are adjusted as the clamping force increases for smaller displacement paths and the mobile clamping jaw can be moved back progressively by operating the release lever (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/06; B25B 5/16; B25H 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19731579 A1 19990128; AU 8853298 A 19990216; CA 2304718 A1 19990204; CA 2304718 C 20090331; CN 100450719 C 20090114; CN 100528490 C 20090819; CN 1136078 C 20040128; CN 1265056 A 20000830; CN 1389328 A 20030108; CN 1899768 A 20070124; DE 19880089 B4 20070419; DE 19880089 D2 19991111; EP 0997232 A2 20000503; EP 0997232 A3 20001122; EP 0997232 B1 20021023; EP 0997233 A2 20000503; EP 0997233 A3 20001122; EP 0997233 B1 20030108; EP 0998373 A1 20000510; EP 0998373 B1 20001227; US 6578837 B1 20030617; WO 9904932 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100626

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100626

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090610

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800409 20010201

2001-01-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991204

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB