Global Patent Index - EP 0998376 A1

EP 0998376 A1 2000-05-10 - IMPACTING DEVICE FOR RELEASING BLOCKED OBJECTS BY IMPACT

Title (en)

IMPACTING DEVICE FOR RELEASING BLOCKED OBJECTS BY IMPACT

Title (de)

SCHLAGVORRICHTUNG ZUM FREISCHLAGEN FESTGEKLEMMTER GEGENSTÄNDE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PERCUSSION POUR LA LIBERATION PAR PERCUSSION D'OBJETS BLOQUES

Publication

EP 0998376 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939535 A

Priority

  • DE 19731732 A
  • EP 9803903 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19731732A1] The invention concerns an impacting device capable of being advantageously used in an impact hammer and/or a drill for releasing by impact tools blocked in rocks. For this purpose, an impact impetus supplied by an impact piston (1) is modified by means of a impact-deflecting device comprising a sliding lever (8) and a deflecting lever (12), such that said impact is carried out in a releasing impact direction (F) opposite the normal impact direction (B) and is transmitted to a tool (4) via a slide (15) and a locking lever (6). The tool (4) is already released after a few strokes produced by the impact piston (1). Said impact device is suitable for both unilateral air springs and double air springs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/14 (2006.01); B25D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/14 (2013.01); B25D 2250/171 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904937A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19731732 A1 19990204; DE 19731732 C2 20010222; EP 0998376 A1 20000510; EP 0998376 B1 20041110; ES 2227870 T3 20050401; JP 2001510741 A 20010807; JP 4124564 B2 20080723; US 6298923 B1 20011009; WO 9904937 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130626

2014-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140708

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812248

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130626

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120827

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120628

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WACKER NEUSON SE, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59812248

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812248

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812248

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-02-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20120208

2011-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: WACKER NEUSON SE#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2009-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON SE

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER NEUSON SE#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2006-01-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-12-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-06-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041110

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227870 T3

2005-03-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812248 P 20041216

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-11-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-11-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-11-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990702

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE