Global Patent Index - EP 0998388 A1

EP 0998388 A1 2000-05-10 - POUCHES FOR PACKAGING FLOWABLE MATERIALS

Title (en)

POUCHES FOR PACKAGING FLOWABLE MATERIALS

Title (de)

BEUTEL ZUM VERPACKEN FLIESSFÄHIGER MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

SACHETS DESTINES A EMBALLER DES MATIERES FLUIDES

Publication

EP 0998388 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97905720 A

Priority

US 9701671 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9834844A1] An environmentally friendly polymer film pouch made from a polyethylene film structure for the packaging of flowable materials, for example milk, including, for example, a pouch made from a monolayer or multilayer film structure such as a two-layer or a three-layer coextruded film containing at least one layer of a blend of a linear ethylene interpolymer and a high pressure low density polyethylene as a seal layer. Also disclosed is a process for making a pouch for packaging flowable materials using a film structure of a blend of a linear ethylene interpolymer and a high pressure low density polyethylene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 27/32; C08J 5/18; C08L 23/04; C08L 23/06; C08L 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 30/02 (2006.01); B32B 27/32 (2006.01); B65D 65/38 (2006.01); C08L 23/06 (2006.01); C08L 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834844 A1 19980813; AU 2254797 A 19980826; AU 742162 B2 20011220; CA 2280910 A1 19980813; CA 2280910 C 20040622; CN 1078160 C 20020123; CN 1246099 A 20000301; DE 69737571 D1 20070516; DE 69737571 T2 20071220; EP 0998388 A1 20000510; EP 0998388 A4 20000510; EP 0998388 B1 20070404; EP 0998388 B9 20071003; ES 2284182 T3 20071101; JP 2001512402 A 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140211

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140212

2015-03-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140211

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-12-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69737571

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69737571

2014-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Effective date: 20140228

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130206

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2284182 T3

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070704

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69737571 P 20070516

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2007-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-04-04 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-04-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-04-04 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2004-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990913

2000-05-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE