Global Patent Index - EP 0998415 A1

EP 0998415 A1 2000-05-10 - SEALING AND TAMPER-PROOF ELEMENT FOR CONTAINER

Title (en)

SEALING AND TAMPER-PROOF ELEMENT FOR CONTAINER

Title (de)

DICHTUNGSELEMENT UND ORIGINALITÄTSVERSCHLUSS FÜR BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

ELEMENT D'ETANCHEITE ET D'INVIOLABILITE POUR RECIPIENT

Publication

EP 0998415 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98930989 A

Priority

  • IB 9801115 W
  • LU 90111 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2297840A1] The invention concerns a combined sealing and tamper-proof element for container (R) whereof the opening (A) is capable of being closed by a lid (C), characterised in that it comprises, in a single piece: a removable inner seal (1) whereof the inner surface is designed to be tightly sealed on the opening (A) rim and the top surface bears a strip (10) forming a prehensile tab; and a joint (2) designed to be maintained in said lid (C) and whereof the bottom surface adheres to the inner seal (1) top surface at least in the zones unoccupied by said strip (10) with a linking force less than the forces maintaining the joint (2) in the lid (C) and the inner seal (1) on the opening (A) rim respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/20 (2006.01); B65D 77/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/20 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0015 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0093 (2013.01); B65D 2577/2058 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905041A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

LU 90111 A1 19980113; AT 219011 T 20020615; AU 8125498 A 19990216; BR 9810797 A 20000725; CA 2297840 A1 19990204; DE 69806011 D1 20020718; DE 69806011 T2 20030102; EP 0998415 A1 20000510; EP 0998415 B1 20020612; ES 2178840 T3 20030101; WO 9905041 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *L & M SERVICES B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040722

2005-07-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040721

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *L & M SERVICES B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040722

2004-07-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040721

2003-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178840

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DIETLIN & CIE SA

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69806011

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 219011

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L & M SERVICES B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000221

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL