Global Patent Index - EP 0998440 A1

EP 0998440 A1 2000-05-10 - IMPROVED VAPOR PHASE OXIDATION OF PROPYLENE TO ACROLEIN

Title (en)

IMPROVED VAPOR PHASE OXIDATION OF PROPYLENE TO ACROLEIN

Title (de)

DAMPFPHASENOXIFDATION VON PROPYLEN ZU ACROLEIN

Title (fr)

OXYDATION PERFECTIONNEE EN PHASE VAPEUR DE PROPYLENE EN ACROLEINE

Publication

EP 0998440 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98934499 A

Priority

  • US 9814511 W
  • US 5569397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903809A1] An improved method for the selective vapor phase oxidation of propylene to acrolein in a recirculating solids reactor system using a bismuth molybdate multimetal oxide involving specific reactant concentrations (preferably 5 mol % to 30 md % propylene, 0 to 20 mol % oxygen, and the remainder inert gas), particle size (1 to 300 micrometers), temperature (250 to 450 DEG C) and gas (1 to 15 seconds) and solids (2 to 60 seconds) residence times. Such a process leads to improved selectivity and propylene conversion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 45/28; B01J 8/38; B01J 23/31; B01J 23/92; C07C 47/22; C07C 201/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/31 (2006.01); B01J 8/00 (2006.01); B01J 8/18 (2006.01); B01J 8/24 (2006.01); B01J 8/26 (2006.01); B01J 8/38 (2006.01); B01J 23/92 (2006.01); B01J 23/94 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 45/28 (2006.01); C07C 45/35 (2006.01); C07C 47/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/94 (2013.01); B01J 8/0055 (2013.01); B01J 8/1863 (2013.01); B01J 8/26 (2013.01); C07C 45/28 (2013.01); Y02P 20/584 (2015.11)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 45/28 + C07C 47/22

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903809A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903809 A1 19990128; AR 013221 A1 20001213; AU 8400798 A 19990210; BR 9810715 A 20000808; CA 2291769 A1 19990128; CN 1263519 A 20000816; EP 0998440 A1 20000510; ID 24324 A 20000713; JP 2000513384 A 20001010; TW 477786 B 20020301; ZA 9806280 B 20000117

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020906

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CONTRACTOR, RASHMIKANT, MAGANLAL

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ANDERSON, MARK, WILLIAM

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CAMPOS, DANIEL

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HECQUET, GERARD

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KOTWICA, ROLAND

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PHAM, CHARLOTTE

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SIMON, MICHEL

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATOFINA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL