Global Patent Index - EP 0998492 A1

EP 0998492 A1 2000-05-10 - COMPOSITION AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES

Title (en)

COMPOSITION AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGSKRANKHEITEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ET PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT D'AFFECTIONS INFLAMMATOIRES

Publication

EP 0998492 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928776 A

Priority

  • SE 9801106 W
  • SE 9702191 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856817A1] The expression of interleukines can be downregulated through the adminstration of a YopJ protein to the site of inflammation. The present invention discloses pharmaceutical compositions and methods for treatment of inflammatory disease in mammals, in particular for the treatment of inflammatory diseaese in the gastrointestinal tract in humans.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/24; A61K 38/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/24 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/164 (2013.01); C07K 14/24 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9856817A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856817 A1 19981217; AU 8049098 A 19981230; EP 0998492 A1 20000510; SE 9702191 D0 19970609

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030410

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INDEX PHARMACEUTICALS AB

2001-06-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INDEX PHARMACEUTICALS AB

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE