Global Patent Index - EP 0998542 B1

EP 0998542 B1 2002-09-25 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEALING LEVELLING DOOR APERTURE OF A COKE OVEN CHAMBER

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEALING LEVELLING DOOR APERTURE OF A COKE OVEN CHAMBER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABDICHTEN EINER PLANIERTÜRÖFFNUNG EINER KOKSOFENKAMMER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR ETANCHEIFIER UN JOUR DE PORTE A NIVELAGE D'UNE CHAMBRE DE FOUR A COKE

Publication

EP 0998542 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98940145 A

Priority

  • DE 19729032 A
  • EP 9804157 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902625A1] The invention relates to a device for sealing a levelling door aperture of a coke oven chamber when loading bulk coking coal. Said device comprises a housing sealingly engaging levelling door aperture, a housing through which is guided a levelling arm (2) composed of at least side spacers (3) and cross spacers (4) joining the latter. Said levelling arm (2) supports means for sealing cross sectional area of the open levelling door or upstream the open levelling door. A controllable or adjustable exhauster (8) is joined to housing (1) and a measurement point (10) is provided for flow rate measurement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 37/02; C10B 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10B 27/04 (2006.01); C10B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 37/02 (2013.01); C10B 27/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902625 A1 19990121; AT 224940 T 20021015; AU 743802 B2 20020207; AU 8856498 A 19990208; CN 1133712 C 20040107; CN 1262700 A 20000809; DE 19729032 C1 19990211; EP 0998542 A1 20000510; EP 0998542 B1 20020925; JP 2001510855 A 20010807; JP 3961766 B2 20070822; KR 100476151 B1 20050310; KR 20010021603 A 20010315; RU 2194068 C2 20021210; TW 567224 B 20031221; US 6918999 B1 20050719; ZA 9805936 B 19990504

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170707

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180201

2018-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170801

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170706

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170706

2018-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180330

2018-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170706

2018-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 224940 T

- Effective date: 20170706

2018-03-13 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-03-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170801

2018-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805721

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805721 20021031

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224940 T 20021015

2002-06-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020213

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE