Global Patent Index - EP 0998544 A1

EP 0998544 A1 2000-05-10 - GREASE COMPOSITION FOR A CONSTANT VELOCITY JOINT

Title (en)

GREASE COMPOSITION FOR A CONSTANT VELOCITY JOINT

Title (de)

SCHMIERFETTZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR HOMOKINETISCHE KUPPLUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION GRAISSEUSE POUR JOINT HOMOCINETIQUE

Publication

EP 0998544 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98945164 A

Priority

  • EP 9804983 W
  • JP 21417197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905240A1] A grease composition for a constant velocity joint, characterised in that it contains from 0.05 to 30 percent by weight of sodium thiosulphate with respect to a base oil and urea-based thickener.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/06 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 30/08 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01); C10N 50/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/06 (2013.01); C10M 2201/065 (2013.01); C10M 2201/066 (2013.01); C10M 2201/08 (2013.01); C10M 2201/081 (2013.01); C10M 2201/082 (2013.01); C10M 2201/084 (2013.01); C10M 2205/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2215/006 (2013.01); C10M 2215/026 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/0813 (2013.01); C10M 2215/1013 (2013.01); C10M 2215/102 (2013.01); C10M 2215/1026 (2013.01); C10M 2215/121 (2013.01); C10M 2215/2206 (2013.01); C10M 2215/2275 (2013.01); C10M 2217/044 (2013.01); C10M 2217/045 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2219/042 (2013.01); C10M 2219/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/082 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2223/047 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 169/06 + C10M 115/08 + C10M 119/24 + C10M 125/22 + C10M 135/12

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905240A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905240 A1 19990204; CN 1097630 C 20030101; CN 1260825 A 20000719; DE 69816085 D1 20030807; DE 69816085 T2 20040519; EP 0998544 A1 20000510; EP 0998544 B1 20030702; JP 3812995 B2 20060823; JP H1135965 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100723

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100723

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100723

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816085 P 20030807

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010824

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991102

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT