Global Patent Index - EP 0998575 A1

EP 0998575 A1 2000-05-10 - CHIMERIC GENE CODING FOR DROSOMICINE, VECTOR CONTAINING IT AND PRODUCTION OF TRANSGENIC PLANTS RESISTANT TO DISEASES

Title (en)

CHIMERIC GENE CODING FOR DROSOMICINE, VECTOR CONTAINING IT AND PRODUCTION OF TRANSGENIC PLANTS RESISTANT TO DISEASES

Title (de)

FÜR DROSOMYCIN KODIERENDES CHIMÄRES GEN, DIESES GEN ENHALTENDER VEKTOR UND HERSTELLUNG VON KRANKHEITSRESISTENTEN TRANSGENEN PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

GENE CHIMERE CODANT POUR LA DROSOMICINE, VECTEUR LE CONTENANT ET OBTENTION DES PLANTES TRANSGENIQUES RESISTANTES AUX MALADIES

Publication

EP 0998575 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98936469 A

Priority

  • FR 9801462 W
  • FR 9709115 A
  • FR 9709663 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902717A1] The invention concerns a chimeric gene containing a DNA sequence coding for drosomicine, a vector containing the chimeric gene, and a method for transforming plants and the resulting transformed plants. The drosomicine produced by the plants provides them with resistance to diseases, in particular of fungal origin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00; A01N 63/00; C07K 14/435; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/43581 (2013.01); C07K 14/00 (2013.01); C12N 15/8216 (2013.01); C12N 15/8282 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902717A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902717 A1 19990121; AR 016326 A1 20010704; AU 739137 B2 20011004; AU 8545198 A 19990208; BR 9815507 A 20001107; CA 2296046 A1 19990121; CO 4810248 A1 19990630; EP 0998575 A1 20000510; FR 2766207 A1 19990122; FR 2766207 B1 20001208; HR P980385 A2 19991231; HU 0004938 A2 20010428; HU 0004938 A3 20021128; IL 133961 D0 20010430; PL 337994 A1 20000925; US 2003167519 A1 20030904; US 6465719 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE S.A.

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE S.A.

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE