Global patent index - EP 0998584 A1

EP 0998584 A1 2000-05-10 - USE OF 2'-O-METHYL RNA AS HYBRIDISATION PROBE

Title (en)

USE OF 2'-O-METHYL RNA AS HYBRIDISATION PROBE

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON 2'-O-METHYL RNS ALS HYBRIDISIERUNGSSONDE

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE L'ARN 2'-O-METHYLE COMME SONDE D'HYBRIDATION

Publication

EP 0998584 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98935182 A

Priority

  • GB 9802176 W
  • GB 9715522 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905314A1] Digestion-resistant probes comprising 2'-O-methyl RNA for nucleic acid hybridisation assays. Their preparation and use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6818 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905314A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905314 A1 19990204; EP 0998584 A1 20000510; GB 9715522 D0 19971001; JP 2001511357 A 20010814

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040219

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASTRAZENECA AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE