Global patent index - EP 0998586 A1

EP 0998586 A1 2000-05-10 - SHAFT FURNACE

Title (en)

SHAFT FURNACE

Title (de)

SCHACHTOFEN

Title (fr)

FOUR VERTICAL

Publication

EP 0998586 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98935032 A

Priority

  • AT 119797 A
  • EP 9804292 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904045A1] The invention relates to a shaft furnace (1), especially a direct reduction shaft furnace, with a fill (2) of bulk material, especially bulk material containing iron oxide and/or sponge iron, discharge devices (4) for the bulk material arranged above the floor area (3) of the shaft furnace (1), as well as inlet openings (6) for a reducing gas which are positioned above the discharge devices (4). Devices (7) for moving the material contained in the shaft furnace (1) are arranged between the area formed by the inlet openings (6) and the area formed by the discharge device (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 13/02; F27B 1/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 13/02 (2006.01); F27B 1/10 (2006.01); F27B 1/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 13/02 (2013.01); F27B 1/10 (2013.01); F27B 1/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904045A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904045 A1 19990128; AT 405332 B 19990726; AT A119797 A 19981115; AU 744469 B2 20020221; AU 8441898 A 19990210; BR 9811694 A 20000926; CA 2296318 A1 19990128; CN 1071381 C 20010919; CN 1263563 A 20000816; DE 59803356 D1 20020418; EP 0998586 A1 20000510; EP 0998586 B1 20020313; JP 2002511906 A 20020416; PL 338180 A1 20001009; TW 407166 B 20001001; US 6213762 B1 20010410; ZA 9806239 B 19990205

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130710

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803356

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-09-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803356

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT LU

2002-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-03-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010727

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT LU