Global Patent Index - EP 0998587 B1

EP 0998587 B1 2001-02-28 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING GRAIN ORIENTED ELECTRIC SHEETS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING GRAIN ORIENTED ELECTRIC SHEETS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KORNORIENTIERTEM ELEKTROBLECH

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TOLES ELECTRIQUES A GRAINS ORIENTES

Publication

EP 0998587 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945171 A

Priority

  • DE 19735062 A
  • EP 9805008 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735062A1] Grain oriented electrical steel sheet is produced from a slab of fine grained globulitic structure, in which \-90% of the grains have a diameter of \}1\/25 of the slab thickness and a shape factor (dmin\/dmax) of \-0.5. A process for producing grain oriented electrical steel sheet involves subjecting a slab of steel of composition (by wt.) more than 0.005-0.10% C, 2.5-4.5% Si, 0.03-0.15% Mn, more than 0.01-0.05% S, 0.01-0.035% Al, 0.0045-0.012% N, 0.02-0.3% Cu, balance Fe and impurities to (a) soaking at below the manganese sulphide solubility temperature (in any case, below 1320 deg C) and above the copper sulphide solubility temperature; (b) hot rolling to a hot rolled strip final thickness of 1.5-7.0 mm using a start temperature of \- 960 deg C and a finish temperature of 880-1000 deg C; (c) annealing for 100-600 s at 880-1150 deg C; (d) cooling at more than 15 K/s; (e) cold rolling in one or more passes to the cold strip final thickness; (f) recrystallisation annealing and simultaneous decarburisation in a wet hydrogen- and nitrogen-containing atmosphere; (g) application of a MgO-containing separator onto both sides, followed by high temperature annealing; and (h) application of an insulating coating, followed by closed annealing. The novelty is that the starting slab has the structure described above, the grain diameter being the diameter of a circle of equivalent area and dmin and dmax being the respective minimum and maximum actual grain diameters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/12 (2006.01); C21D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/1222 (2013.01); C21D 8/1205 (2013.01); C21D 3/04 (2013.01); C21D 8/1261 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735062 A1 19990218; AT 199403 T 20010315; BR 9811935 A 20000829; EP 0998587 A1 20000510; EP 0998587 B1 20010228; ES 2156033 T3 20010601; KR 20010022777 A 20010326; WO 9909221 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL A.G.

- Effective date: 20040831

2005-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040807

2005-05-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL A.G.

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040807

2004-08-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040807

2004-08-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040806

2003-09-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030912

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030806

2002-07-10 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020710

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156033 T3

2001-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800501 20010405

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199403 T 20010315

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-08-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING GRAIN ORIENTED ELECTRIC SHEETS

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE