Global Patent Index - EP 0998588 A1

EP 0998588 A1 2000-05-10 - INERT TANK FOR TREATING OXIDABLE LIQUID METAL

Title (en)

INERT TANK FOR TREATING OXIDABLE LIQUID METAL

Title (de)

ABGEDICHTETES GEFÄSS ZUR BEHANDLUNG OXIDIERBAREN FLÜSSIGMETALLS

Title (fr)

CUVE INERTEE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE METAL LIQUIDE OXYDABLE

Publication

EP 0998588 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98937596 A

Priority

  • FR 9801487 W
  • FR 9709238 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766209A1] The invention concerns an inert tank for treating an oxidable liquid metal (3), comprising a metal tank body and lid internally protected with an inert refractory lining (1, 13), said tank body comprising a plurality of inlets and outlets (17) for the liquid metal such that they avoid all contact between the liquid metal (3) placed in the tank and the external environment, the inerting system comprising at least two of the following devices: a) an additional sealing shell (4, 15) enclosing the tank body metal wall (2, 14), the resulting double additional shell containing a dry gas; b) an inflatable joint (20) between the lid and the tank body; c) sealing means (34-36, 40-46) on the assembly of removable and/or movable auxiliary equipment (gas injector, heating element, thermo-elements and others) passing through the lid and optionally a pressure regulating device (25-27) for adjusting the internal pressure to a value higher than atmospheric pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 21/06; C22B 9/05; F27D 3/16; F27D 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/28 (2006.01); C22B 9/02 (2006.01); C22B 9/05 (2006.01); C22B 21/06 (2006.01); F27B 3/19 (2006.01); F27D 3/16 (2006.01); F27D 99/00 (2010.01); F27D 1/00 (2006.01); F27D 1/18 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01); F27D 19/00 (2006.01); F27D 27/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 99/0073 (2013.01); C22B 9/05 (2013.01); C22B 21/064 (2013.01); F27D 3/16 (2013.01); F27D 1/1808 (2013.01); F27D 27/00 (2013.01); F27D 2001/0073 (2013.01); F27D 2003/0036 (2013.01); F27D 2019/0009 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904046A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766209 A1 19990122; FR 2766209 B1 19990827; AT 208434 T 20011115; AU 8633898 A 19990210; CA 2296749 A1 19990128; CA 2296749 C 20070918; DE 69802409 D1 20011213; DE 69802409 T2 20020829; EP 0998588 A1 20000510; EP 0998588 B1 20011107; ES 2166180 T3 20020401; JP 2001510238 A 20010731; NO 20000206 A 20000316; NO 20000206 D0 20000114; NO 322601 B1 20061030; US 6331269 B1 20011218; WO 9904046 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-09-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2166180

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69802409

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-13

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 208434

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991228

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT