Global Patent Index - EP 0998589 A1

EP 0998589 A1 2000-05-10 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING "LIGHT STEEL" BY CONTINUOUS CASTING WITH GAS INCLUSION

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING "LIGHT STEEL" BY CONTINUOUS CASTING WITH GAS INCLUSION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON "LEICHTSTAHL" IN FORM VON STRANGGUSS UNTER GASEINSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION POUR LA FABRICATION D'ACIER LEGER EN COULEE CONTINUE AVEC INCLUSION GAZEUSE

Publication

EP 0998589 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939634 A

Priority

  • DE 19730084 A
  • EP 9804348 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904047A1] The problem with continuous casting methods is the production in a single cast of structured material shapes presenting hollow cavities. To this end the invention provides for a continuous casting method comprising the following steps: a) the material is melted and a continuous strand formed from said material; b) the material strand is cooled or left to cool so that at least a part thereof has a temperature at which its structure is pasty; c) gas is introduced into that part of the material strand which has a pasty structure so as to form hollow cavities, the material strand being moved from the top towards the bottom; and d) the material is left to solidify. The invention also relates to a device for carrying out this method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/08; B22D 11/04; B22D 11/10; B22D 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 11/11 (2006.01); B22D 11/16 (2006.01); B22D 27/00 (2006.01); C22C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/041 (2013.01); B22D 11/11 (2013.01); B22D 27/003 (2013.01); C22C 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904047A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904047 A1 19990128; AT 207131 T 20011115; EP 0998589 A1 20000510; EP 0998589 B1 20011017; JP 2001510096 A 20010731; US 6263953 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2006-07-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040713

2003-07-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EMIL *DENGLER UNTERNEHMENSBERATUNG

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-08-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-04-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20011017

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2002-01-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020117

2001-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801803

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-22

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-10-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 207131

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE