Global patent index - EP 0998600 A1

EP 0998600 A1 2000-05-10 - TEXTURING MACHINE

Title (en)

TEXTURING MACHINE

Title (de)

TEXTURIERMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A TEXTURER

Publication

EP 0998600 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924969 A

Priority

  • DE 19822885 A
  • EP 9903316 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961690A1] The invention relates to a texturing machine comprised of a plurality of processing positions for thermoplastic threads. A take-off spool, a first delivery device, a longitudinally extended first heating device, a longitudinally extended cooling device, a false twist group, a second delivery device, and a spooling device are arranged in each processing position. In addition, a plurality of take-off spools are arranged one above the other in a creel frame, and a plurality of take-up devices are arranged one above the other in a roller frame. The first delivery device, the heater and the cooling device are located above the frames. In order to guarantee a thread course without damaging the same and an ability to handle, the first delivery device, in an operating position, is arranged with a drive directly in front of the entry to the first heating device. As a result, the first delivery device, with or without the drive, can be adjusted in the position thereof for applying a thread in a handling position underneath the operating position in such a way that the delivery device cannot be driven in the operating position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/02 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

D01C (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/0266 (2013.01); D02G 1/0273 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961690A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961690 A1 19991202; CN 1108403 C 20030514; CN 1272151 A 20001101; DE 59902405 D1 20020926; EP 0998600 A1 20000510; EP 0998600 B1 20020821; JP 2002516931 A 20020611; TR 200000183 T1 20001121; TW 583357 B 20040411; US 6209301 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080514

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090119

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070514

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070518

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070514

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HERMANN KAHLHOEFER

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902405

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-26

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011026

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI