Global patent index - EP 0998601 A1

EP 0998601 A1 2000-05-10 - WARP KNITTING MACHINE, ESPECIALLY CROCHETING MACHINE

Title (en)

WARP KNITTING MACHINE, ESPECIALLY CROCHETING MACHINE

Title (de)

KETTENWIRKMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE HÄKELGALONMASCHINE

Title (fr)

METIER A TRICOTER CHAINE, EN PARTICULIER, MACHINE A CROCHET

Publication

EP 0998601 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98929184 A

Priority

  • CH 9800288 W
  • CH 179897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905351A1] The invention relates to a warp knitting machine, especially a crocheting machine, comprising knitting needles (34) guided on a knock-over sinker(38) with warp thread layers (38) which are fitted upstream with warp thread guides (36) and weft thread layer rods (44) assigned to weft thread guides (48). The invention provides an improvement to a warp knitting machine, characterized in that the weft thread guides (48) of the weft thread layer rods (44) do not cross the knitting needles(34) and the weft thread guides (48) of the weft thread layer rods (44) are assigned feeding means relative to the knitting needles (34), which can be guided and driven upwards and downwards between the weft thread guides (48) and the knitting needles (34) in such a way that the feeding means (62) place staggered weft threads (50) underneath the assigned knitting needles (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 27/24; D04B 23/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 27/26 (2006.01); D04B 23/22 (2006.01); D04B 25/06 (2006.01); D04B 27/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 27/24 (2013.01); D04B 23/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905351A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905351 A1 19990204; AU 7904098 A 19990216; BR 9811550 A 20000829; BR 9811550 B1 20081118; CN 1079457 C 20020220; CN 1264439 A 20000823; DE 59803026 D1 20020321; EP 0998601 A1 20000510; EP 0998601 B1 20020206; ES 2169527 T3 20020701; HK 1027137 A1 20020614; JP 2001511488 A 20010814; JP 4128328 B2 20080730; RU 2190709 C2 20021010; TW 436546 B 20010528; US 6209362 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-09-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140905

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803026

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2169527

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803026

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-21

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991204

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI