Global Patent Index - EP 0998603 A1

EP 0998603 A1 2000-05-10 - IRON COMPRISING TWO HEATING MEANS WITH PARTICULAR AUTOMATIC TEMPERATURE CONTROL MODE

Title (en)

IRON COMPRISING TWO HEATING MEANS WITH PARTICULAR AUTOMATIC TEMPERATURE CONTROL MODE

Title (de)

BÜGELEISEN MIT ZWEI HEIZVORRICHTUNGEN UND MIT EINER BESONDEREN TEMPERATURSTEUERUNG

Title (fr)

FER COMPORTANT DEUX MOYENS DE CHAUFFE AVEC UN MODE D'ASSERVISSEMENT EN TEMPERATURE PARTICULIER

Publication

EP 0998603 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98940305 A

Priority

  • FR 9801612 W
  • FR 9709537 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766502A1] The invention concerns a steam electric iron, comprising a hot part including the sole plate (1) and an evaporation chamber (2), the hot part being divided into two thermal zones, a first zone corresponding substantially to the evaporation chamber (2) being provided with first heating means (3), a second zone corresponding substantially to a sole plate (1) portion arranged beneath the evaporation chamber (2) being provided with second heating means (4), the first heating means (3) being associated with a regulating member (5) arranged in said first zone, the first heating means (3) being provided to partially ensure the second zone heating. The invention is characterised in that the second heating means (4) are associated with the first zone regulating member (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/24; D06F 75/18; D06F 75/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/18 (2006.01); D06F 75/24 (2006.01); D06F 75/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/24 (2013.01); D06F 75/18 (2013.01); D06F 75/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905355A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766502 A1 19990129; FR 2766502 B1 19990917; AU 8866298 A 19990216; BR 9810918 A 20000815; CA 2297265 A1 19990204; CN 1264441 A 20000823; DE 69804315 D1 20020425; DE 69804315 T2 20021010; EP 0998603 A1 20000510; EP 0998603 B1 20020320; ES 2174471 T3 20021101; JP 2002509466 A 20020326; TR 200000184 T2 20001023; US 6263596 B1 20010724; WO 9905355 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050723

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050722

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2005-07-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050722

2005-07-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050722

2004-07-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040708

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174471 T3

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804315 20020425

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL