Global Patent Index - EP 0998609 A1

EP 0998609 A1 2000-05-10 - SOIL COMPACTING DEVICE WITH ADJUSTABLE VIBRATION PROPERTIES

Title (en)

SOIL COMPACTING DEVICE WITH ADJUSTABLE VIBRATION PROPERTIES

Title (de)

BODENVERDICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERÄNDERBAREN SCHWINGUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN

Title (fr)

ENGIN DE COMPACTAGE DU SOL A PROPRIETES VIBRATOIRES MODULABLES

Publication

EP 0998609 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943738 A

Priority

  • DE 19731731 A
  • EP 9804441 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19731731A1] The invention relates to a soil compacting device in which the damping properties of a damping system (4), which in a vibration system couples an upper mass (1) and a lower mass (3) together with a spring system (2), can be modified while the device is in operation. Therefore, when the soil compacting device passes over soils having different properties it can constantly be adjusted in an optimal manner to the ground underneath it by acting on the vibration properties of the overall vibration system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/38; E02D 3/046

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/38 (2006.01); E02D 3/046 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/046 (2013.01); E01C 19/38 (2013.01); Y10T 74/1856 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905362A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19731731 A1 19990225; EP 0998609 A1 20000510; EP 0998609 B1 20010328; JP 2001511490 A 20010814; US 6213681 B1 20010410; WO 9905362 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040717

2003-07-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030715

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG TRANSFER- WACKER CONSTR

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800580 20010503

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-03-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990823

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE