Global Patent Index - EP 0998611 A1

EP 0998611 A1 2000-05-10 - A MARINA SYSTEM

Title (en)

A MARINA SYSTEM

Title (de)

JACHTHAFENANLAGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DESTINE A UNE MARINA

Publication

EP 0998611 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98936640 A

Priority

  • IE 9800062 W
  • IE 970530 A
  • IE S970531 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905365A1] A paving material, walkway (1) or marina system comprising a deck (3) and support means (2) for supporting the deck (3) characterised in that the paving material, walkway (1), marina system or deck comprises glass fibre reinforced concrete, and a process for the manufacture of a paving material or walkway comprising forming a deck (3) from glass fibre reinforced concrete and mounting the deck (3) on a support means (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 3/068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905365A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CY DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905365 A1 19990204; AU 8557698 A 19990216; DE 69829055 D1 20050324; EP 0998611 A1 20000510; EP 0998611 B1 20050216

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-04-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-07-25 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050725

2005-07-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-05-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050527

2005-05-18 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050516

2005-05-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050516

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829055 P 20050324

2005-03-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CY DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-02-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: C O S HOLDINGS LIMITED

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020830

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000214

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CY DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT