Global patent index - EP 0998624 A1

EP 0998624 A1 2000-05-10 - CONDITIONING UNIT FOR LUBRICATING OIL

Title (en)

CONDITIONING UNIT FOR LUBRICATING OIL

Title (de)

KONDITIONIEREINHEIT FÜR SCHMIERÖL

Title (fr)

UNITE DE CONDITIONNEMENT POUR HUILE LUBRIFIANTE

Publication

EP 0998624 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98938655 A

Priority

  • DE 19731558 A
  • EP 9803908 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19731558A1] The invention concerns a conditioning unit for lubricating oil, to be mounted in particular in a motor vehicle, comprising a device filtering lubricating oil, provided with a filtering element (3), metal-free and renewable, and a by-pass valve (11), and an oil-cooling device (2) mounted in the oil-circulating system. The filtering device (3) comprising the filter by-pass valve is mounted on the conditioning unit body (1). On said body (1) is also located the oil-cooling device (2), a heat-exchanger (6) between the oil and a cooling agent, and another by-pass valve (16) for said heat exchanger (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/03 (2013.01); F01M 2011/033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905399A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19731558 A1 19990128; EP 0998624 A1 20000510; EP 0998624 B1 20030409; WO 9905399 A1 19990204; ZA 9806545 B 19990203

INPADOC legal status

2009-12-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20090917

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-10-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DEUTZ AG

- Effective date: 20040108

2004-04-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DEUTZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20040108

2004-03-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DEUTZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20040108

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MANN + HUMMEL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010330

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE