Global Patent Index - EP 0998629 A1

EP 0998629 A1 2000-05-10 - REGULATED LINEAR PURGE SOLENOID VALVE

Title (en)

REGULATED LINEAR PURGE SOLENOID VALVE

Title (de)

GEREGELTES LINEAR-TANKLÜFTUNGSMAGNETVENTIL

Title (fr)

ELECTROVANNE LINEAIRE A PURGE REGULEE

Publication

EP 0998629 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98931868 A

Priority

  • CA 9800663 W
  • US 90097697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905408A1] A pressure regulator is associated with a solenoid-operated valve that may be operated by a pulse waveform at a fundamental frequency substantially greater than the frequency response of the valve mechanism. The pressure regulator causes a predetermined pressure differential across the valve mechanism that is independent both of pressure at the outlet of the regulator and pressure at the inlet of the valve, thereby providing improved flow control accuracy. The invention is especially advantageous for purging fuel vapor generated in a fuel tank to an intake manifold of an internal combustion engine of an automotive vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/08 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01); F16K 31/128 (2006.01); G05D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/0836 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905408A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905408 A1 19990204; AU 8203498 A 19990216; DE 69808638 D1 20021114; DE 69808638 T2 20030626; EP 0998629 A1 20000510; EP 0998629 B1 20021009; JP 2001511547 A 20010814; JP 3452900 B2 20031006

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040709

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-09-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030916

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030710

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808638 20021114

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE INC.

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011204

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991215

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB