Global Patent Index - EP 0998650 A1

EP 0998650 A1 2000-05-10 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING HOT WATER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRODUCING HOT WATER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITUNG VON HEISSWASSER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'EAU CHAUDE

Publication

EP 0998650 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98939725 A

Priority

  • FR 9801594 W
  • FR 9709550 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766558A1] The invention concerns a device for producing hot water comprising at least a burner (13) arranged to produce a rapid combustion inside the combustion chamber. The combustion chamber is formed by a sealed container (14) delimiting an internal volume separated from the water so as to allow a dry combustion. Said container (14) is immersed in a water section (12) and is extended by at least a smoke gas diffuser (15) diffusing the smoke gases above the water section within a mass of water showered by spraying means (10). A layer of nodules (11) can be interposed on the path of the smoke gases and the sprayed water so as to increase the thermal exchange generated, by direct contact between the smoke gases and the water spray, and by conduction between the container (14) and the water section (12). The invention enables to achieve excellent thermal efficiency levels while producing smoke gases with a reduced CO ratio.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/107 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905461A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766558 A1 19990129; FR 2766558 B1 19990924; AU 8813898 A 19990216; CA 2297282 A1 19990204; CA 2297282 C 20060620; DE 69803462 D1 20020228; DE 69803462 T2 20021107; EP 0998650 A1 20000510; EP 0998650 B1 20020109; ES 2171302 T3 20020901; US 6223698 B1 20010501; WO 9905461 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140722

2015-08-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150828

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69803462

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-02-25 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69803462

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130725

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130725

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130704

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LACAZE S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LACAZE S.A., INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, , FR

- Document: DE 69803462

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LACAZE S.A., INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, , FR

- Document: DE 69803462

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LACAZE S.A., LEYME, FR; INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON, HAUTS-DE-SEINE, FR

- Document: DE 69803462

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LACAZE S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LACAZE S.A., LEYME, FR; INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON, HAUTS-DE-SEINE, FR

- Document: DE 69803462

- Effective date: 20110329

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2171302 T3

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-04-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803462 20020228

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020110

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL PT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL PT