Global Patent Index - EP 0998716 A2

EP 0998716 A2 2000-05-10 - SYSTEM FOR DISPLAYING INFORMATION ON DISTRIBUTED AUTOMATED TRANSACTION MACHINES

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR DISPLAYING INFORMATION ON DISTRIBUTED AUTOMATED TRANSACTION MACHINES

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM ANZEIGEN VON INFORMATIONENÜBER VERTEILTE AUTOMATISIERTE TRANSAKTIONSMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS SUR DES AUTOMATES TRANSACTIONNELS DECENTRALISES

Publication

EP 0998716 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98941929 A

Priority

  • NO 9800222 W
  • NO 973451 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908214A2] A system for displaying information on distributed automated transaction devices (2) is described. The information which is to be displayed is stored in a central unit (4), and is transferred to a local unit (1) for display on a screen (11) in an automated transaction device (2) under the control of the local unit (1). Which of a plurality of information messages should be displayed is decided on the basis of a number of criteria determined by the person who wishes to distribute the information message. By means of the system pauses are detected in the automated transaction devices (2), and a message is displayed on the automated transaction device's screen (11) for the duration of the pause. The local unit (1) updates the central unit (4) frequently with regard to the number of exposures, and criteria such as the priority given to the various messages are altered as a result of these updatings. For their part the local units (1) are updated by the central unit (4) when new priorities are calculated, or when new messages or criteria are specified.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2006.01); G07F 9/02 (2006.01); G07F 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908214A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908214 A2 19990218; WO 9908214 A3 19990415; AU 736364 B2 20010726; AU 9008398 A 19990301; CA 2297925 A1 19990218; CA 2297925 C 20090414; EP 0998716 A2 20000510; JP 2001512871 A 20010828; NO 306132 B1 19990920; NO 973451 A 19990126; NO 973451 D0 19970725; US 6489935 B1 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029639

2012-07-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120302

2012-03-02 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050216

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OETR OEKONOMISK TRANSAKSJONS REKLAME AS

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AMUNDSEN, FINN VIGGO

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE