Global patent index - EP 0998738 A1

EP 0998738 A1 2000-05-10 - RESONANCE BODY FOR A STRING INSTRUMENT

Title (en)

RESONANCE BODY FOR A STRING INSTRUMENT

Title (de)

KLANGKÖRPER FÜR EIN SAITENINSTRUMENT

Title (fr)

CORPS DE RESONANCE POUR INSTRUMENT A CORDES

Publication

EP 0998738 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929076 A

Priority

  • DE 9901291 W
  • DE 19819851 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19819851A1] The invention relates to a resonance body for a string instrument, comprising a top grid (6) shaped as a frame on which a soundboard (4) is glued, on which at least a bridge (8) extending almost diagonally and a cast iron frame fitted with a string stretcher are provided, in addition to a bottom grid arranged beneath and connected to the top grid (6). In order to ensure that tuning is preserved as long as possible, even in case of fluctuations in room temperature, the top grid (6) is attached to the bottom grid (16) only in the diagonally opposing connecting areas (18a, 18b) facing the ends of the above-mentioned bridge while the remaining edge areas (12a, 12b) are slightly separated from the bottom grid (16)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10C 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10C 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957708A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19819851 A1 19991125; DE 19819851 C2 20000608; AT 234496 T 20030315; EP 0998738 A1 20000510; EP 0998738 B1 20030312; JP 2002513958 A 20020514; US 6239339 B1 20010529; WO 9957708 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-12-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-07-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904522

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020626

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991104

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT